Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Randall County Et Al, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by William C. Pinkham, against Fuller, Shawn, Davis, Justin Shea, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
CHECK REQUEST LUBBOCK CO $60 LUBBOCK CO $60 |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
CHECK REQUEST PERDUE $400 PERDUE $400 |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Filed Order of Sale | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT/STATEMENT OF DISTRIBUTION ~ copy of Distribution Sheets from RCSO; copy of receipts on Court Costs. ~ copy of Distribution Sheets from RCSO; copy of receipts on Court Costs. |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCUMENTS -- INSTRUCTIONS -- INSTRUCTIONS |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST ORDER OF SALE PACKET ORDER OF SALE PACKET |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ISSUED ORDER OF SALE | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ DAVIS, JUSTIN SHEA Served 08/03/2017 | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.