Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Randall County Et Al, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by William C. Pinkham, against Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance Inc, Valverde, Rafaela, Valverde, Adolfo, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Filed Order of Sale | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCUMENTS -- CLEARING ACCT $8.00 -- CLEARING ACCT $8.00 |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCUMENTS -- EMAIL REMOVE FROM APRIL SALE -- EMAIL REMOVE FROM APRIL SALE |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ VALVERDE, ADOLFO Served 04/11/2017 Returned 04/03/2017 | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ISSUED ORDER OF SALE | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY 01-20-17 Plaintiff appeared by counsel. Default Judgment signed. RD, by Assignment 01-20-17 Plaintiff appeared by counsel. Default Judgment signed. RD, by Assignment |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.