Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson, Jared Paul, Johnson, Charlee Mckinnon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Taylor, Amy Senter, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE BOARD CONFIRMING SETTING OF HEARING 11-26-18 AT 1:30 PM TO JUDGE BOARD CONFIRMING SETTING OF HEARING 11-26-18 AT 1:30 PM |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT TO MODIFY P-C RELATIONSHIP IN SUIT TO MODIFY P-C RELATIONSHIP |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED TEMP ORDERS IN SUIT TO MODIFY P-C RELATIONSHIP SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON ON 7-23-18 PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED TEMP ORDERS IN SUIT TO MODIFY P-C RELATIONSHIP SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON ON 7-23-18 |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE BOARD UNABLE TO REACH AN AGREEMENT AT THIS TIME TO JUDGE BOARD UNABLE TO REACH AN AGREEMENT AT THIS TIME |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SIGN TEMPORARY ORDERS TO SIGN TEMPORARY ORDERS |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RETAINING SUIT ON DOCKET | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON RETENTION AND PRETRIAL ORDER-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON RETENTION AND PRETRIAL ORDER-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER ON MOTION TO RETAIN-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER ON MOTION TO RETAIN-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.