Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
King, Viola, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against King, Tommy Collie, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE LET/RETURNED | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - WANT OF PROSECUTION SIGNED 6.25.15, 1PG SIGNED 6.25.15, 1PG |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Calls (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Schaap, Dan L) | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Other CANCELED Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Schaap, Dan L) Other |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOT/OF INTENT TO DWOP | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOT/OF INTENT TO DWOP (NOD) NOT/OF INTENT TO DWOP NOT/OF INTENT TO DWOP (NOD) |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
WAIVER 062231A 04/05/2010 WAIVER TOMMIE WAIVER (W) 062231A 04/05/2010 WAIVER TOMMIE WAIVER (W) |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED 062231A 03/12/2010 CITATION SERVED TOMMY/3-11-10/60.00/BRAD EVERETT CITATION SERVED (CS) 062231A 03/12/2010 CITATION SERVED TOMMY/3-11-10/60.00/BRAD EVERETT CITATION SERVED (CS) |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
TRO SERVED/UNSERVED 062231A 03/12/2010 TRO SERVED/UNSERVED TOMMY/3-11-10/30.00/BRAD EVERETT TRO SERVED/UNSERVED (TROS) 062231A 03/12/2010 TRO SERVED/UNSERVED TOMMY/3-11-10/30.00/BRAD EVERETT TRO SERVED/UNSERVED (TROS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.