Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tiffee, James Pete, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tiffee, Rosario Charo, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO JAMES JOHNSTON AND BRIAR WILCOX E-FILED TO JAMES JOHNSTON AND BRIAR WILCOX |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER MODIFYING P/C RELATIONSHIP 1-23-18 25 pgs 1-23-18 25 pgs |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER MODIFYING P-C RELATIONSHIP SIGNED BY JUDGE GLEASON 1-23-18 ORDER MODIFYING P-C RELATIONSHIP SIGNED BY JUDGE GLEASON 1-23-18 |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED IN SUIT TO MODIFY P-C RELATIONSHIP-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED IN SUIT TO MODIFY P-C RELATIONSHIP-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Anderson, James, Anderson - CC, James) | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE EVALUATOR FOR EVALUATION FOR PARENTAL ALIENATION ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE EVALUATOR FOR EVALUATION FOR PARENTAL ALIENATION |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE EVALUATOR FOR EVALUATION FOR PARENTAL ALIENATION-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE EVALUATOR FOR EVALUATION FOR PARENTAL ALIENATION-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE EVALUATOR FOR EVALUATION FOR PARENTAL ALIENATION-JAMES TIFFEE TO MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE EVALUATOR FOR EVALUATION FOR PARENTAL ALIENATION-JAMES TIFFEE |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION to Substitute Evaluator for Evaluation for Parental Alienation to Substitute Evaluator for Evaluation for Parental Alienation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.