Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Norris, Shelly Diane Groves, Shelly, Groves, Shelly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Norris, Larry Wayne, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT/S FILED AG 1 AG 1 |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Zoom: Mr. Olguin w/ father, mother prose, OAG DePoyster; agreement ann'd atty signature only, JFowler, Associate Judge Zoom: Mr. Olguin w/ father, mother prose, OAG DePoyster; agreement ann'd atty signature only, JFowler, Associate Judge |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Fowler, Jeremy) | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ZOOM - ORDER SETTING HEARING 7-11-23 @ 9:30 AM 7-11-23 @ 9:30 AM |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: parties appeared, Mr. Olguin represents Mr. Norris, who requested reschedule to gather documents, granted-JFowler Associate Judge Zoom: parties appeared, Mr. Olguin represents Mr. Norris, who requested reschedule to gather documents, granted-JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Fowler, Jeremy) | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED LARRY - 3/10/23 - TARRANT COUNTY LARRY - 3/10/23 - TARRANT COUNTY |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED SHELLY-3-7-23-RCSO SHELLY-3-7-23-RCSO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.