Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Patterson, James Stanley, Patterson, Emma Joy, Patterson, Allison Nicole, Patterson, Addy Hope, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Patterson, Kathleen Larae, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2004 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED E-FILED |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (OCA) AGREED-SIGNED 10/7/15, 26 PGS AGREED-SIGNED 10/7/15, 26 PGS |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED SENT TO WF QUE-251ST PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED SENT TO WF QUE-251ST |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER NEW JOB, FROM KATHLEEN PATTERSON NEW JOB, FROM KATHLEEN PATTERSON |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Other CANCELED Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.