Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Reyna, Gloria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reyna, Ernesto, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2002 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PLACE OF PAYMENT 050867C 10/29/2002 NOTICE OF PLACE OF P REDIRECT - SDU NOTICE OF PLACE OF PAYMENT (NP) 050867C 10/29/2002 NOTICE OF PLACE OF P REDIRECT - SDU NOTICE OF PLACE OF PAYMENT (NP) |
|
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
DOCKET SHEET (DOCKET) DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET (DOCKET) |
|
June 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
$DISP ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
June 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD (EOW) EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD (EOW) Vol./Book IS |
|
June 27, 2002 | Docket Event | OTHER | |
June 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
ISSUANCE WAGE ASSIGMENT 050867C 06/27/2002 ISSUANCE WAGE ASSIGM XCEL ENERGY BY PETITIONER ISSUANCE WAGE ASSIGMENT (IWA) 050867C 06/27/2002 ISSUANCE WAGE ASSIGM XCEL ENERGY BY PETITIONER ISSUANCE WAGE ASSIGMENT (IWA) |
|
June 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE (OCA) 050867C 06/27/2002 DECREE OF DIVORCE FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED 6-27-02, 49 PAGES DECREE OF DIVORCE (DD) Vol./Book IS 050867C 06/27/2002 DECREE OF DIVORCE FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED 6-27-02, 49 PAGES DECREE OF DIVORCE (DD) |
|
June 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE 050867C 06/17/2002 N ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNED JUDGE AND ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF AN OBJECTION PURSUANT TO 74.053 OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE NOTICE (N) 050867C 06/17/2002 N ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNED JUDGE AND ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF AN OBJECTION PURSUANT TO 74.053 OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE NOTICE (N) |
|
June 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
ORDER 050867C 06/17/2002 N ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNED JUDGE AND ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF AN OBJECTION PURSUANT TO 74.053 OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE ORDER (ORDER) 050867C 06/17/2002 N ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNED JUDGE AND ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF AN OBJECTION PURSUANT TO 74.053 OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE ORDER (ORDER) |
|
March 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS TEMPORARY ORDER (TO) TEMPORARY ORDER (TO) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.