Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Frausto, Michelle Renee, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2001 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeChd |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRECEPT SERVED ENRIQUE ENRIQUE Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Schaap, Dan L)
Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY OAG ann'd nonsuit OAG ann'd nonsuit Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Fowler, Jeremy)
Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE REQUEST REQUEST FOR SERVICE Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRECEPT AG GALVAN, ENRIQUE Returned Unserved 02/20/2018 Returned 02/20/2018
Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
ISSUED PRECEPT- AG ENRIQUE-PCSO ENRIQUE-PCSO Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESET ORDER 2/21/18 2:30 PM 2/21/18 2:30 PM Judge: Judge, Legacy Converted Disposition:Party: GALVAN, ENRIQUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.