Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hodges, Vanessa Diane, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Cothren, Jesse James, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2000 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
DOCKET SHEET (DOCKET) DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET (DOCKET) |
|
December 01, 2001 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED 048278C 12/01/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: COURT COST DUE CONVERTED (CONV) 048278C 12/01/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: COURT COST DUE CONVERTED (CONV) |
|
December 01, 2001 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED 048278C 12/01/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: COSTS DUE CONVERTED (CONV) 048278C 12/01/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: COSTS DUE CONVERTED (CONV) |
|
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event |
EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD 048278C 05/14/2001 EMPLOYERS ORDER WITH Desc: ORD/NOT W/H C/S EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD (EOW) 048278C 05/14/2001 EMPLOYERS ORDER WITH Desc: ORD/NOT W/H C/S EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD (EOW) |
|
May 10, 2001 | Docket Event | OTHER | |
May 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED 048278C 05/10/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: STAT OUT CONVERTED (CONV) Vol./Book 107, Page 1 048278C 05/10/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: STAT OUT CONVERTED (CONV) |
|
March 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO ESTABLISH P/C RELATIONSHIP (OCA) 048278C 03/22/2001 ORDER TO ESTABLISH P Desc: ORD.ESTAB. P/C- ORDER TO ESTABLISH P/C RELATIONSHIP (EPC) 048278C 03/22/2001 ORDER TO ESTABLISH P Desc: ORD.ESTAB. P/C- ORDER TO ESTABLISH P/C RELATIONSHIP (EPC) |
|
March 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
NOTICE 048278C 03/22/2001 NOTICE Desc: NOT. C/S LEIN NOTICE (N) 048278C 03/22/2001 NOTICE Desc: NOT. C/S LEIN NOTICE (N) |
|
March 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED 048278C 03/22/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: -RELATIONSHIP CONVERTED (CONV) 048278C 03/22/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: -RELATIONSHIP CONVERTED (CONV) |
|
February 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED 048278C 02/27/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: -FOR VANESSA CONVERTED (CONV) 048278C 02/27/01 Event Comment from Co Desc: -FOR VANESSA CONVERTED (CONV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.