Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jameson, Kristen, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Mcconnell, Sean, against Precision Chiropractic, Raef, D.C., Jeremy, represented by Freeman, Christopher D, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage-Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR JERRY GILLIS JR., DC (MEDICAL) ON 9/16/21, QUEST RECORDS & REPORTING, FEES CHARGED TO DEFENDANT, $166.50 |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR JERRY GILLIS JR., DC (BILLING) ON 9/16/21, QUEST RECORDS & REPORTING, FEES CHARGED TO DEFENDANT, $65.00 |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR HIGH PLAINS DERMATOLOGY (MEDICAL) ON 9/27/21, QUEST RECORDS & REPORTING, FEES CHARGED TO DEFENDANT, $65.00 |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR HIGH PLAINS DEMATOLOGY (MEDICAL) ON 9/27/21, QUEST RECORDS & REPORTING, FEES CHARGED TO DEFENDANT, $140.50 |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions (SEAN ANTHONY MCCONNELL, WINCKLER & HARVEY LLP) |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Defendant West Texas Multicare Clinic, P.A. D/B/A Precision Chiropractic's Original Answer and Jury Demand |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT JEREMY RAEF, D.C.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION JEREMY RAEF, D.C., SERVED ON 8/10/21, POTTER COUNTY SHERIFF, $90.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.