Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Peregrine Ep Ii, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bryan, Justin N., against Cheatham, Tracy B., Cheatham, Richard, Cb Energy, Llc, Tsar-Wv, Llc, represented by Illmer, Richard A, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM COURT TO ATTORNEY/S AND/OR PARTIES dated 10/8/2021 to Attorneys from LaDon Brown (Court has DENIED Defendant's plea in abatement, please send an Order that reflects the Court's ruling) |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom - hrg on Def's plea in abatement - PCS |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Plea in Abatement |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Notice of Zoom Hearing on Defendants' Verified Plea in Abatement and, Subject Thereto, Original Answer (Set for: 9/27/21 at 1:00 PM by ZOOM meeting meeting information is noted on the Notice) |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND, SUBJECT THERETO, ORIGINAL ANSWER **IMAGES ATTACHED TO PLEA IN ABATEMENT** |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLEA IN ABATEMENT Defendants' Verified Plea in Abatement and, Subject Thereto, Original Answer |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement (Defendant's Acceptance of Service of Citation and Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment) | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTIFIED MAIL TSAR-WV, LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT, CAPITOL SERVICES, INC., DELIVERY DATE OF 7/22/21, SIGNED BY SHC106109, ARTICLE # 9414 7266 9904 2183 9844 79 |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTIFIED MAIL CB ENERGY LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT, CAPITOL SERVICES, INC., DELIVERY DATE OF 7/22/21, SIGNED BY SHC16019, ARTICLE # 9414 7299 9904 2183 9844 48 |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTIFIED MAIL TO RICHARD CHEATHAM (1918 OLIVE ST., APT 2403, DALLAS TX 75201), DELIVERY DATE 7/23/21 (SIGNED BY COVID-19), ARTICLE NUMBER 9414 7266 9904 2183 9844 55 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.