Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kranthoven, Fedor, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Gerguis, Maria, against Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, represented by Egeland, Susan E, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 47th District Court with Schaap, Dan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchaap, Dan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court House47th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Filing Notice of Removal |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTIFIED MAIL Allstate Vehicle and Property insurance co bu agent CT Corporation System; date of delivery 7/14/2021; received by Kirk Atkins; article #9414 7266 9904 2183 9844 17 |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE - CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL DEFENDANT: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY; ARTICLE #9414 7266 9904 2183 9844 17 |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.