Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Texas Farm Bureau Mutual Ins. Co., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Wells, Jason E., against J-N-B Quicki Shops, Inc., represented by Naylor, Richard C., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION SERVED J-N-B QUICKI SHOPS, INC. BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT, JOHN WILKE ON 7/27/21, RICK MCCLAIN, NO FEE LISTED |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER REQUESTING COPIES dated 8/11/2021 to clerk from Jason E. Wells (Request a copy of defendant's answer) |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | General Denial | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE - CITATION PERSONAL SERVICE | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE dated 7/1/2021 to clerk from Jason E. Wells (issue citation) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.