Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Francis, April, Francis, Jeremy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hoffman, Chris G., against Brown, Ramon A, Specialized Rail Service, Inc., represented by Lesher, Barrett C., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTIFIED MAIL SERVED SPECIALIZED RAIL SERVICE, INC. BY REGISTERED AGENT, MATT PIGOTT, DELIVERED ON 5/17/21, SIGNED BY C19 |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION Ramon A. Brown served in person by process server, Deybar Jimenez, on 05/13/2021; SERVICE FEE: NONE NOTED |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - Citation by certified mail - Specialized Rail Service, Inc. |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE - CITATION PERSONAL SERVICE DEFENDANT: RAMON A BROWN |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - Citation - Ramon Brown |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE - CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL DEFENDANT: SPECIALIZED RAIL SERVICE, INC.; ARTICLE #9414 7266 9904 2183 9836 18 |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) Plaintiffs' Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.