Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Co-Counsel, Fayebuck Family, Llc, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases case represented by Barton, Jared W., Sherwood, Matt W., against Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co., represented by Ziemianski, Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
|
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATED 5/10/21 TO CLERK FROM JARED BARTON; (REQUESTING BILL OF COST AND FOR IT TO BE EMAILED) |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LETTER FORM DATED 5/6/2021 TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FROM JARED BARTON (TO COURT VACATING HEARING SET FOR 5/6/21 AT 9:30 AM) |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SECRETARY OF STATE Secretray of State's Certificate of Service |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTIFIED MAIL WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO.; ARTICLE NUMBER 9414 7266 9904 2161 0739 28; DELIVERY DATE OF 3/26/21 |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTIFIED MAIL SERVED SECRETARY OF STATE FOR WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO.; ARTICLE NUMBER 9414 7266 9904 2161 0739 28 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.