Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcbane Diamond, Llc Dba Diamond M., Successor In Interest To Everett Mcbane Dba, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Elza, Slater C., against Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S, Ray, Jeff, Twi Agency, Inc., represented by Brown, J. Daren, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SERVED 9/21/21 TO KENT SULLIVAN, TRAVIS COUNTY PCT. 5, $80.00 |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE Underwriters |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION First Amended Petition |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE - CITATION PERSONAL SERVICE | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT/S ORIGINAL ANSWER (TWI AGENCY, AND JEFF RAY) |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION JEFF RAY SERVED IN PERSON ON MARCH 25, 2021 BY POTTER COUNTY SHERIFF, SHANE WATSON |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD CITATION SERVED TWI AGENCY, INC. C/O AARON KING ON 3/25/21, POTTER CO. SHERIFF |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE Jeff Ray - Emailed |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE TWI Agency, Inc. - Emailed |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE - CITATION PERSONAL SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.