Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Crouch Foundation, None, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases case against None, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
|
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FINAL JUDGMENT AUTHORIZING DEVIATION FROM TERMS OF CHARITABLE WILL; JUDGE ESTEVEZ ON 02/07/2020 |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE Proposed Final Judgment Authorizing Deviation from Terms of Charitable Will |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner's attorney John Brown appeared. Co-counsel - ERic Wolfram appeared. Katherine Cheng from the attorney general office appeared via phone. Matt Sherwood withdrew objection. Opening statement - John Brown. Petitioner called James Beckham - sworn and testified. Eric Wolfram called Justin Kite - sworn and testified. Relief granted. Waiting on order. |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike Intervention | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Plea in Abatement to Enforce Arbitration Clause | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT/S OBJECTION Objection to Petition to Construe Will, and in the Alternative, Authorize Deviation From Terms of Charitable Will |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION Supplement to Petition to Construe Will, and in the Alternative Authorize Deviation From Terms of Charitable Will |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING ( ** IS SET FOR 8/08/19 AT 1:30 PM BEFORE THE 251ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT AT THE POTTER COUNTY COURTS BUILDING, 501 SOUTH FILLMORE STREET, FOURTH FLOOR, AMARILLO, TEXAS *** SIGNED 7/19/19 BY JUDGE ESTEVEZ) |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER Attorney General's Notify Letter 7.9.19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.