Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gerado, Edgar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcconnell, Ed, against Garcia, Christopher, Soto Trucking, Soto, Ricky, represented by Russell, Charles F., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 181st District Court with Board, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoard, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury And Property Damage-Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House181st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (ED MCCONNELL); SIGNED 7/7/20 BY JUDGE BOARD |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER AMENDED ORDER OF RETENTION AND PRE-TRIAL ORDER, SIGNED 6/15/20 BY JUDGE BOARD |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER AMENDED ORDER OF RETENTION AND PRE-TRIAL ORDER; SIGNED 6-9-20 BY JUDGE BOARD |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE Amended Order of Retention and Pre-Trial Order |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT FROM ATTORNEY DATED 6/05/20 FROM ED MCCONNELL TO HONORABLE JOHN B BOARD (REFERRING TO AN ORDER OF RETENTION) |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO CLIENTS; AGREEMENT TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW RECORD OF ATTORNEY ED MCCONNELL |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF RETENTION AND PRE-TRIAL ORDER SIGNED ON 5/7/2020 BY JUDGE BOARD | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RETAIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.