Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aguilera, Gabriel Anthony filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared, father in Lubbock Co. Jail |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Temp. Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE VIA ZOOM |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS GABRIEL AGUILERA |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE TEMPORARY ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING (ZOOM NOTICE) |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: Ms. Velasquez appeared, Mr. Aguilera did not appear, default temp, orders entered, OAG DePoyster to draft, final 2/28/21 at 1:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.