Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Uifsa |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION AUSTIN HARRINGTON SERVED 06/09/2021 BY POTTER |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION AUSTIN HARRINGTON |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE CORRECTED |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE BY ZOOM.US |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE CORRECTED ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING (ZOOM NOTICE) |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) UNIFORM INTERSTATE FAMILY SUPPORT ACT PETITION |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER RECEIVED BY CLERK UNSIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING - OAG TO SUBMIT NEW ORDER WITHOUT SMUDGING PARAGRAPH 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.