Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #1 with Weaver, Walt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeaver, Walt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: Ms. Garcia pro se sworn and testified, NCP served, FTA; orders rendered, OAG DePoyster to draft default order, JFowler associate Judge |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING VIA ZOOM |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared , 2b reset |
|
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION SONIA GARCIA SERVED 1/13/2022 BY P/S |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.