Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mars, Jordan Jean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Balderrama, Juan Demetrio, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJune 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Case called and party/parties announced ready. Evidence received. Judgment rendered by the court. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION JUAN DEMETRIO BALDERRAMA SERVED 5-8-2021 BY P/S |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED PRECEPT JUAN DEMETRIO BALDERRAMA SERVED 5-8-2021 BY P/S |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE PRECEPT | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION BY PERSONAL SERVICE ENV #53089584 |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS AND ORDER TO APPEAR signed. May 18, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 05/18/2021 9:30 AM |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS AND ORDER TO APPEAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.