Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION JOSE GUZMAN |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.