Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedJune 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION TAYLOR TRIPLETT SERVED 04/19/2021 BY POTTER |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION KIMBERLY ANN TRIPLETT SERVED 04/07/2021 BY POTTER |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION CALEB TRIPLETT SERVED 04/06/2021 BY POTTER |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION BRIANNA TRIPLETT, CALEB TRIPLETT, AND KIMBERLY TRIPLETT |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) ORIGINAL PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.