Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Hand, Matthew H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHand, Matthew H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE VIA ZOOM |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY T/O signed, JFowler |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom hrg: both parties appeared, pro se, sworn and testified; temp orders rendered, final in August, OAG Blackburn to draft, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE TEMPORARY ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.