Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL AGREED ORDER ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED 05/13/2021 |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom hrg: both parties appeared, pro se, reached agreement, ratified under oath, OAG DePoyster to draft, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION ANGELICA RANGEL SERVED 04/22/2021 POTTER CO |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.