Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2022 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE /ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION DUSTIN GRAY AND TYLER BROOKS |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE BY ZOOM.US |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared; |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.