Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Hand, Matthew H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHand, Matthew H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Default Order signed today at 2:55 PM, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP / SIGNED 6-24-19 |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called: Mr. Watson served, FTA, Ms. McMinn pro se sworn and testified, OAG Estrada, case taken under advisment, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION SERVED 05/21/19 BY DEAF SMITH |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION ATHENA MCMINN SERVED 4-23-19 SERVED BY POTTER CO. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION REQUEST FOR SERVICE |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.