Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY OAG filed nonsuit |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION DANNY BRYANT UNSERVED BY GREGG |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION DANNY W. BRYANT NOT SERVED BY GREGG CO. SHERIFF |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION DANNY BRYANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.