Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Norris, Kirstee Lane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rodriguez, Eli, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CERTIFIED MAIL CARD BERT DODD FOR PROGRESS RAIL SERVIES CORP |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY EMPLOYER'S WITHHOLDING ORDER signed. |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
MAIL WAGE WITHHOLDING ORDER PROGRESS RAIL SERVIES CORP PO BOX 1037 ALBERTVILLE, AL 35950 9414726699042111246037 |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SIGNED 01-08-19 |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SAPCR signed. |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE ORDER TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION ELI RODRIGUEZ SERVED 12-17-18 BY PS - $75 FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.