Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL ADJUDICATION OF NONPARENTAGE |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | PATERNITY EVALUATION REPORT | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PATERNITY TEST | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY PTO Feb 19 1:30, Mr. Hooper in Lubbock County Jail |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION ASHLEY BOGGS SERVED 10/23/18 BY POTTER CO $75 |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION GLENN HOOPER SERVED 10/05/18 NO FEE LISTED |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.