Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allen, Celestine filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Chandler, K'Dreana Latasia, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY OAG ann'd nonsuit |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION K'DREANA L. CHANDLER SERVED 11-13-18 BY EZ MESS - NO FEE |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY | |
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION UNSERVED $75 PSCO |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.