Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Father, Unknown, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURNED NOTICE | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Order signed at 10:09 AM today, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called: OAG Blackburn, Ms. Grammer on behalf of unknown father, Ms. Smith AKA Ms. Fleming pro se sworn and testified, Ms. Velasquez, Served, FTA; case taken under advisment, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY FEE VOUCHER - FAMILY | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY OR ADLITEM | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.