Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION KIYANNA RIVERA UNSERVED BY POTTER $75 |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY OAG ann'd nonsuit |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION KIYANNA RIVERA |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION UNSERVED |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY no one appeared, reset to 12-4-18 8:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.