Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED 03/25/19 |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called: OAG DePoyster, Ms. Baca pro se sworn and testified, Mr. Doan served FTA, submitted to DNA testing, + DNA test; Order rendered and signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
PATERNITY EVALUATION REPORT DNA TEST REPORT |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | RESET ORDER | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.