Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ardagna, Cynthia Yvonne, represented by Mckibben, Dallas, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUED PRECEPT - SERVICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF INDICTMENT | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP ARTICLE 39.14 | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | INDICTMENT (OCA) | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 38.22 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
BAIL BOND FILED - POTTER COUNTY LICENSED COMPANY 0028/ SAVIOR BB $3500 5/28/21 |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL DALLAS MCKIBBEN |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S WARNING | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL INFORMATION STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.