Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Harris, Jessica Rochelle, represented by Watkins, Mike, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedJune 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION - GUILTY PLEA OR NOLO CONTENDRE (OCA) 48 DAYS IN COUNTY JAIL $0 FINE 6/8/21 |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Defendant and attorney Mike Watkins appeared. Case called and parties announced ready. Defendant waived jury, confrontation of witnesses and entered plea of guilty. Defendant found to be mentally competent and her plea found to be voluntary. Evidence received and defendant found guilty as charged in the indictment. 12.44(a) prosecution. Punishment assessed at 48 days PCDC. Defendant waived right to appeal, sentenced, and was time served. |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP ARTICLE 39.14 | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUED PRECEPT - SERVICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF INDICTMENT | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | INDICTMENT (OCA) | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
BAIL BOND FILED - POTTER COUNTY LICENSED COMPANY 0028/Savior Bail Bonds $2,000.00 01/18/2021 |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Mike Watkins |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.