Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Torres, Salvador, Jr., represented by Williamson, L Van, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , State - Jason Howell and Ian Marable appeared. Defendant and attorney Van Williamson appeared. Reopened. State called Michael Johnson - sworn and testified. State rested. Defendant called Salvador Torres - admonished, sworn and testified. Both sides argued and closed. Found guilty in all 3 cases. 2 years TDCJ-ID for 78017C and 5 years TDCJ-ID in 79287C and 5 years TDCJ-ID for 80350-C. |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Sentencing | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT - SERVED | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R., State -Jason Howell and Ian Marable appeared in person. Defendant and attorney Van Williamson appeared. Both parties announced ready. Defendant called Salvador Torres - admonished, sworn, and testified. Defendant rested. State closed. Defendant closed. Both parties argued. Court found Defendant guilty in all three cases. Break State read the enhancement paragraph. Defendant pleaded true. State called Karen Leal - sworn and testified. State called Erika Galvan - sworn and testified. State rested. Defendant called Salvador Torres - sworn and testified. Defendant rested. State closed. Defendant closed. Ordered Pre sentence report. Held for sentencing. |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF JURY Trial |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP ARTICLE 39.14 | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R., State -Jason Howell and Ian Marable appeared in person. Defendant and attorney Van Williamson appeared. State (Jason Howell) read all three indictments. Defendant pleaded "not guilty" to all three indictments. Rule invoked - witnesses sworn. State - Ian Marable - opening statement. Defendant reserved opening. State called - Officer John McDaniel - testified. State called Officer Anthony Kennedy - testified. State called Jaycin Smotherman - testified. State called Walden Chen - testified. State called Ashley Ernst - sworn and testified. State rested. |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | STATE'S WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.