Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Smith, Miranda M, represented by Stemple, D. Dale, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , State - Jason Howell and Defendant's attorney Dale Stemple appeared in person. Defendant did not appear. Bond forfeited. |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUED PRECEPT - SERVICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF INDICTMENT | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | INDICTMENT (OCA) | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | BAIL BOND FILED - APPEARANCE BOND/PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF DISPOSITION CARD | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Signed PR bond card $3,500 - PCS |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL D Dale Stemple |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.