Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Albarran, Anna Elvia filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
INVOICE INTEGRITY TRANSLATION |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called: OAG DePoyster, Mr. Perales certified interpreter, Ms. Medrano pro se, Ms. Lucreo with Mr. Albarran-Campuzano; partial agreement ann'd as to contempt & susp. commit; rec'd sworn testimony both parties, orders judgment as of 12/31/2019 payable at $150 starting 9/1/20; mod granted at min wage 1/1/20 256 for months of Jan-Jun 2020, 647 starting July 1, health insurance thru medicaid, $50 medical support; Ms. DePoyster to draft, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG-PRECEPT ROBERTINO ALBARRAN |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY case reset due to courthouse locked due to COVID19 7/29/20 9:30 |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM COURT MASTER REGARDING HEARING BEING HELD REMOTELY |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | RESET ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.