Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanders, Justin Patrick filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Levi, Jason Edward, represented by Carey, Darrell, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSirmon, Pamela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2019 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Docket Call | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PRECEPT - SERVED | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | TRANSFER ORDER | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUED PRECEPT - SERVICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF INDICTMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.