Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Drain, Linda filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bowie, Markee Devon, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2012 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER Attorney Fee Voucher |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AMENDING CONDITIONS OF PROBATION | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S PLEA ON COMMUNITY SUPERVISION REVOCATION | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURTS CERTIFICATION OF DEFTS RIGHT TO APPEAL | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING / AMENDING COMMUNITY SUPERVISION ( OCA) Prob. Ext. 2 Yrs |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Judgment Extending | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Proceed | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R., State - Alton Estrada and Morgan Tilley. Defendant and attorney Cody Pirtle appeared. Defendant pleaded true. Court found true. State called Kellie Genoa - sworn and testified. State rested. Defendant called Markee Bowie - admonished, sworn, and testified. Argument. Continue deferring finding of guilt. Extend 2 years. ACADA, TRAS evaluation |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Proceed | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER TO DEFENDANT FROM JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.