Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Swinhoe, Walter Justin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Swinhoe, Rachael Roberts, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig Towson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Decree (OCA) | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Final Order Mailed | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Decree (OCA) | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Result: Ruling on Record | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.