Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bitterwood Springs, Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wesley C. Stripling, Iv, against Moore, Stephen, Arrowhead Productions, Lp, Arrowhead Production Management, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Arrowhead Productions, LP Served 08/24/2021 Moore, Stephen Served 08/24/2021 Arrowhead Production Management, LLC Served 08/24/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.