Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Coldiron, Erin, Coldiron, Jacob, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Thomas G Kemmy, against Golden Coast Express, Inc., Rahlan, Amloc, represented by Thomas W. Fee, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig Towson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RULE 166 PRETRIAL (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.