Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kerr, Craig Steven, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kerr, Robin Gaye, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig Towson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Decree (OCA) | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Final Order Mailed | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediated Settlement Agreement | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS Agreed Resolution CANCELED TEMPORARY ORDERS (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Agreed Resolution 09/01/2021 Reset by Court to 09/22/2021 |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.