Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lovinger, Mark, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Lovinger, Roberta Lee, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig Towson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) 03/11/2021 Reset by Court to 04/28/2021 | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Result: Continued | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Response |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.