Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mullen, Richard, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Magdalena Villalobos, against Buford-Thompson Company, Ltd., Aledo Independent School District, represented by Stephen D. Harrison, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 526370 Vol./Book 526370 |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation ALEDO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT Unserved | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation BUFORD-THOMPSON COMPANY, LTD. Served 01/08/2009 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | File | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.