Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Benthall, Dusty, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Frank J. Webb, against Sunbeam Products, Inc, represented by Charles T. Weigel, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 543143 Vol./Book 543143 |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC Served 01/05/2009 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | File |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.